VA SB747 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee substitute printed 20108346D-H1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Nutrient and sediment credit generation and transfer; limit certain transfers to private sector. Limits certain transfers of nonpoint nutrient credits to those credits generated by the private sector. The bill provides that while any locality may, without the involvement of a third party, generate its own nutrient or sediment credits and request that such credits be certified by the Department of Environmental Quality, such certifications shall only be used for the purpose of determining whether the project complies with credit generation requirements with certain requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nutrient and sediment credit generation and transfer; limits certain transfers to private sector.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108346D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB747S1
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107387D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107387D-S1
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103284D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.19:21.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback