VA SB745 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in Appropriations (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in Appropriations (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Modification of sentence for marijuana-related offenses. Creates a process by which persons convicted of certain felony marijuana-related offenses committed prior to July 1, 2021, who remain incarcerated or on community supervision on July 1, 2022, shall receive an automatic hearing to consider modification of such person's sentence. The bill also provides that a person is eligible to be considered for parole if such person was convicted of a felony conviction, except for an act of violence, and had such felony conviction sentence enhanced because of a felony marijuana conviction and such offense was committed on or after January 1, 1995, and the person was committed by a court to the Department of Corrections and remained incarcerated for such offense on July 1, 2022.
Title
Marijuana-related offenses; modification of sentence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Appropriations (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Appropriations (10-Y 12-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Reconsidered by Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107177D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22106159D-ES1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB745ES1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106159D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Incorporates SB518 (Lucas) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106159D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103531D |
Same As/Similar To
SB518 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB518 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB518 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary