VA SB742 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Rental or lease of dog or cat prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits the rental or lease of a dog or cat to a consumer, including by a purported sale of the animal in a manner that vests less than full equity in the consumer at the time of the purported sale. The bill prohibits the sale of a dog or cat in which the animal is subject to repossession upon default of the agreement and prohibits any financial institution from offering a loan for which the animal is subject to repossession upon default of the loan. The bill provides that a violation of the provisions of the bill is a violation of the Consumer Protection Act and a business that violates the provisions of the bill may also have its retail license suspended or revoked. The bill exempts certain animals from its prohibitions, including purebred dogs leased for breeding; dogs or cats used in spectator events, motion pictures, racing, or other entertainment; and service dogs, guide or leader dogs, security dogs, law-enforcement dogs, military working dogs, and certified facility dogs. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs or cats; rental or lease prohibited, civil penalty, exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 1/1/21)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB742ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-03SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N)
2020-03-02HousePassed House with amendments (53-Y 45-N)
2020-03-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-03-02HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-03-02HouseRead third time
2020-02-28HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2020-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103159D-E
2020-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB742E
2020-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-31SenateRead second time
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
2020-01-15SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103159D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326513.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB742&201+sum+SB742
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB742+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB742E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB742ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0630+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0029+SB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0244SB0742+SB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0274SB0742+SB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0251+SB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1704+SB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1417SB0742+SB0742

Bill Comments

feedback