VA SB742 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Summary
Moratorium on city annexation and county immunity notices and proceedings. Provides that the moratorium on annexation proceedings does not end following the expiration of the 2006-2008 or the 2008-2010 biennium if, for the 2008-2010 biennium, actual appropriations to local governments for law-enforcement expenditures are less than the amount statutorily required.
Title
Annexation proceedings; extends moratorium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 347 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB742ER) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-26 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Passed House (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 082814208-E | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB742E | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 082814208 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB742 |