VA SB740 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; common interest communities; standards for structural integrity and reserves for capital components; work group; report. Directs the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation (the Department) to establish a work group to study the adequacy of current laws addressing standards for structural integrity and for maintaining reserves to repair, replace, or restore capital components in common interest communities. The bill directs the Department to report the work group's findings and provide recommendations, including any legislative recommendations, to the Chairs of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology no later than April 1, 2023. Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; common interest communities; standards for structural integrity and reserves for capital components; work group; report. Directs the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation (the Department) to establish a work group to study the adequacy of current laws addressing standards for structural integrity and for maintaining reserves to repair, replace, or restore capital components in common interest communities. The bill directs the Department to report the work group's findings and provide recommendations, including any legislative recommendations, to the Chairs of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology no later than April 1, 2023.
Title
Common interest communities; standards for structural integrity and reserves for capital components.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB740ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House (59-Y 39-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22105165D-ES1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB740ES1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105165D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105165D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22100206D |