VA SB74 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (4-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


Use of handheld personal communications devices while driving. Expands the prohibition on using a handheld personal communications device while operating a motor vehicle to all communications unless the device is specifically designed to allow voice and hands-free operation and the device is being used in that manner. Current law prohibits only the reading of an email or text message and manually entering letters or text in the device as a means of communicating. The bill expands the exemptions to include handheld personal communications devices that are used (i) for navigation or generating audio transmissions when the device is physically mounted to the vehicle, (ii) as a citizens band radio, (iii) by federally licensed amateur radio operators under certain circumstances, or (iv) by an operator who activates, deactivates, or initiates a factory-installed feature or function on the vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Handheld personal communications devices; use while driving.


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (4-Y 11-N) (Y: 4 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-01-24SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (4-Y 11-N)
2018-01-22SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2018-01-22SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2018-01-22SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105161D-S1
2018-01-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-22SenateRead second time
2018-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateIncorporates SB441 (Wexton)
2018-01-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105161D-S1
2018-01-17SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
2017-12-01SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101511D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621078.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments