VA SB737 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Navigation on freshwaters. Provides that the freshwaters of the Commonwealth shall be open to nonmotorized vessels for purposes of recreation between sunrise and sunset. This policy will apply regardless of whether the water body is deemed to be navigable or nonnavigable or whether the adjoining banks are publicly or privately owned.
Title
Nonmotorized vessels; freshwaters of State shall be open certain times for purposes of recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N 1-A) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N 1-A) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB737S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104163D-S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104163D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100547D |