VA SB735 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms. Establishes insurance, taxation, recordkeeping, disclosure, and safety recall requirements for peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, defined in the bill. The taxation provisions will become effective on October 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; definitions, establishes requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (88-Y 3-N) (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1266)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1266 (effective - see bill)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB735ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (88-Y 3-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 3-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB735ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26SenateTitle replaced 20108534D-H1
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB735H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108534D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108534D-H1
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20108051D-ES2
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB735ES2
2020-02-11SenateAmendment by Senator Newman agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108051D-S2
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20107434D-S1
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108051D-S2
2020-02-10SenateIncorporates SB750 (Cosgrove)
2020-02-10SenateIncorporates SB749 (Cosgrove)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N 1-A)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107434D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105109D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822204(n/a)See Bill Text
4621408(n/a)See Bill Text
4621415(n/a)See Bill Text
5811745(n/a)See Bill Text
5811748(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.29(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.31(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.32(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB735&201+sum+SB735
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735ES2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB735ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1266+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0090+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0287+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0591SB0735+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0599SB0735+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0606SB0735+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1001V0043+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0313+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0332+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0387+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1478+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1106SB0735+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1954SB0735+SB0735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2256+SB0735

Bill Comments

feedback