VA SB730 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile offenders; sentence modification. Provides a mechanism for a person convicted of a nonhomicide offense committed on or after January 1, 1995, while the person was a juvenile, and who is sentenced to life or a term of confinement that would be completed after his 60th birthday, to petition for a modification of sentence at age 35 or after serving 20 years of the sentence, whichever occurs later.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile offenders, certain; sentence modification procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2015-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-02-09HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2015-01-30HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-01-30HouseRead first time
2015-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2015-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2015-01-23SenatePassed by for the day
2015-01-23SenateReconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-23SenatePassed by for the day
2015-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2015-01-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N)
2014-12-12SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-12-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100383D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171406(n/a)See Bill Text
171410(n/a)See Bill Text
192305.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback