VA SB73 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Overweight permits for hauling Virginia-grown farm produce; bridges and culverts. Provides that no five-axle-combination vehicle shall be issued an overweight permit for hauling Virginia-grown farm produce unless such vehicle has no less than 42 feet of axle space between extreme axles. The bill provides that no vehicle issued an overweight permit for hauling Virginia-grown farm produce shall cross any bridge or culvert in the Commonwealth if the gross weight of such vehicle is greater than the amount posted for the bridge or culvert as its carrying capacity. Current law requires specific weight limitations based upon axle weights or axle spacing. This bill is identical to HB 214.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overweight permits; vehicles for hauling Virginia-grown farm produce over bridges and culverts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB73ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment from Appropriations agreed to
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment from Transportation rejected
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-03-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-22HouseReported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2018-01-22SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateReported from Transportation (8-Y 4-N 1-A)
2017-12-01SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100733D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621148(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB73
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB73+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB73ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0612+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0015+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0072SB0073+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0097SB0073+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H19V0130+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0208V0014+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0210+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1411+SB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1069SB0073+SB0073

Bill Comments

feedback