VA SB728 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; prescriber and dispenser patterns. Requires the Director of the Department of Health Professions to annually review controlled substance prescribing and dispensing patterns. The bill requires the Director to conduct such review in consultation with an advisory panel consisting of representatives from the relevant health regulatory boards, the Department of Health, the Department of Medical Assistance Services, and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill requires the Director to make any necessary changes to the criteria for unusual patterns of prescribing and dispensing and report any findings and recommendations for best practices to the Joint Commission on Health Care by November 1 of each year. This bill is identical to HB 313.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; prescriber and dispenser patterns, annual review, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB728ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB728S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105239D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105239D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101925D |