VA SB727 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Football Stadium Authority. Establishes the Virginia Football Stadium Authority as a political subdivision charged with financing the construction of a football stadium and related facilities. The Authority is authorized to hire independent contractors, enter contracts, acquire property, borrow money, and exercise other similar powers. The Authority is exempt from the Personnel Act and the Public Procurement Act. The Authority may issue bonds with a maximum maturity date of 40 years. Virginia Football Stadium Authority. Establishes the Virginia Football Stadium Authority as a political subdivision charged with financing the construction of a football stadium and related facilities. The Authority is authorized to hire independent contractors, enter contracts, acquire property, borrow money, and exercise other similar powers. The Authority is exempt from the Personnel Act and the Public Procurement Act. The Authority may issue bonds with a maximum maturity date of 40 years. The bill entitles the Authority to sales tax revenues from transactions at the stadium but would exclude certain revenues that current law dedicates to transportation and education. The bill also entitles the Authority to corporate income tax revenues from football teams that use the stadium and personal income tax revenues from income generated by employment or the conduct of business at the stadium. The Authority receives all corporate income tax revenues but only 4.25 percent of personal income tax revenues. Remaining personal income tax revenues accrue to the general fund. The Authority is made up of nine members appointed by the Governor and subject to confirmation by the General Assembly. Four of the nine members are appointed from a list chosen by the football team that primarily will use the stadium. The bill enables localities to exercise their eminent domain power to acquire property and convey it to the Authority. It also authorizes localities to appropriate tax revenues to the Authority.
Title
Virginia Football Stadium Authority; established, definitions, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-02 | House | Delegates: Knight, Marshall, Hayes |
2022-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Saslaw, Newman, Ebbin |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (30-Y 10-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-02 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB727H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106884D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106884D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22106150D-ES1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB727ES1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106150D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106150D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104298D |
Same As/Similar To
SB727 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Authorities
Counties Cities and Towns
Sporting Exhibitions Events and Facilities
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Counties Cities and Towns
Sporting Exhibitions Events and Facilities
Study Commissions Committees and Reports