VA SB727 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public access to noncriminal records. Clarifies public access to noncriminal records maintained by public bodies engaged in criminal law-enforcement activities. The bill reverses an April 2015 Virginia Supreme Court decision in Fitzgerald v. Loudoun County Sheriff's Office, which held that a noncriminal record must be a compilation in order for the exemption for noncriminal records to apply. The bill was also the subject of a Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council opinion (AO-08-15) concerning this exemption, which highlighted the need for clarification of this exemption based on the Fitzgerald holding.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public access to noncriminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 184 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2016 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB727ER) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB727S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105373D-S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB676 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105373D-S1 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16101516D |
Same As/Similar To
SB676 (Similar To) 2016-02-08 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
HB1318 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
HB1318 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)