VA SB725 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Classification of land and improvements for tax purposes; City of Richmond. Authorizes the City of Richmond to impose a tax rate on improvements to real property that is different than the City's tax rate on the land upon which the improvements are located, provided that the tax rate is not zero and does not exceed the tax rate imposed on the land. Under current law, the Cities of Fairfax, Roanoke, and Poquoson have the authority to tax improvements and land at different rates.
Title
Classification of land and improvements for tax purposes; City of Richmond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 13-N) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 790 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB725ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (84-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House (84-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102259D |