VA SB723 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB723

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Bail; data collection and reporting standards; report. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to (i) collect data relating to bail determinations for any person who is held in custody pending trial or hearing for an offense, civil or criminal contempt or otherwise, in every locality; (ii) create a uniform reporting mechanism for criminal justice agencies to submit such data; and (iii) submit an annual report on the data collected to the Governor and the General Assembly, as well as publish the annual report on the Department's website. The bill also requires the Department to report to the House Committee for Courts of Justice by January 1, 2021, on the development and application of the uniform reporting mechanisms. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021, for provisions related to the creation of uniform reporting mechanisms and data collection by the Department. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail; data collection and reporting standards, report, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseContinued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
2020-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2020-02-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108932D-H1
2020-02-24HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20107865D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB723ES1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107865D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107865D-S1
2020-02-05SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102492D

Same As/Similar To

SB723 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192119.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192134.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB723
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB723+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB723S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB723ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB723H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB723AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB723F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB723FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB723FES1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03C0214+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0228+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0457SB0723+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0520SB0723+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0521SB0723+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0522SB0723+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0523SB0723+SB0723
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08C0389+SB0723

Bill Comments

feedback