VA SB720 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

E-911 dispatchers; training in telecommunicator cardiopulmonary resuscitation and emergency medical dispatch. Requires each public safety answering point (PSAP) to provide training and equipment for each of its dispatchers in high-quality telecommunicator cardiopulmonary resuscitation (TCPR) instruction, which is defined in the measure as the delivery by trained 911 telecommunicators of high-quality cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction for acute events requiring cardiopulmonary resuscitation, including out-of-hospital cardiac arrests. The measure (i) requires the State Board of Health to adopt regulations that establish training and equipment standards and (ii) authorizes a PSAP to enter into reciprocal agreements with another PSAP to transfer callers to the other PSAP at times that the initial PSAP does not have a trained dispatcher on duty able to provide TCPR. The measure establishes immunity from civil damages for dispatchers who instruct a caller on TCPR. The measure also requires each operator of a PSAP to implement a requirement that each of its dispatchers complete an Emergency Medical Dispatch education program by July 1, 2024, and to conduct ongoing quality assurance of its TCPR program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PSAP dispatchers; definitions, telecommunicator cardiopulmonary resuscitation; EMD program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (86-Y 10-N) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 15-N) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB720ER)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (86-Y 10-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (86-Y 10-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-02HouseDelegates: Hope, Gooditis, Wilt
2020-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-28SenateSenators: McClellan, Bell, Ebbin
2020-02-28SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-28SenateSenate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N)
2020-02-26HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse insisted on substitute with amendment
2020-02-25SenateHouse substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (82-Y 15-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (82-Y 15-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB720H1
2020-02-21HouseAmendment by Delegate Hope agreed to
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108505D-H1
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108505D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB720S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108044D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108044D-S1
2020-02-09SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103020D

Same As/Similar To

HB727 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB720&201+sum+SB720
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB720+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB720S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB720H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB720ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0127+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0459SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0279+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1164+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0956SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1255SB0720+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1956+SB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1777SB0720+SB0720

Bill Comments

feedback