VA SB720 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Grayson County. Adds Grayson County to the list of counties authorized to levy a transient occupancy tax not to exceed five percent. The bill makes technical revisions.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; adds Grayson County to list of counties authorized to levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 319 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB720ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 23-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed House (77-Y 23-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (15-Y 6-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100402D |