VA SB719 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting by persons age 65 or older. Entitles persons age 65 or older on the day of an election for which an absentee ballot is requested to vote absentee.
Title
Elections; absentee voting by persons age 65 or older.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Sen. John Miller [D] | Sen. Jeffrey McWaters [R] | Sen. Jennifer Wexton [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB719S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104078D-S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB910 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB822 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB758 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB708 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104078D-S1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Elections |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100753D |
Same As/Similar To
SB708 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB758 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB822 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB910 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB758 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB822 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB910 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections