VA SB715 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Injunctions; review by the Supreme Court of Virginia. Restores the Supreme Court of Virginia's jurisdiction over appeals of injunctions and orders granting or denying pleas of immunity. Under current law, injunctions must first be appealed to the Court of Appeals. Injunctions; review by the Supreme Court of Virginia. Restores the Supreme Court of Virginia's jurisdiction over appeals of injunctions and orders granting or denying pleas of immunity. Under current law, injunctions must first be appealed to the Court of Appeals.
Title
Injunctions; review by the Supreme Court of Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 307 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB715ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House with amendment (78-Y 22-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB715S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106453D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106453D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104872D |