VA SB714 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Local economic development expenditure. Provides that any local economic development expenditure shall be first approved by the local governing body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local economic development; expenditure shall be first approved by local governing body.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (6-Y 7-N) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Local Government
2018-02-06SenateContinued to 2019 in Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReconsidered by Local Government
2018-01-30SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Local Government (6-Y 7-N)
2018-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 18106404D-S1
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2018-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103334D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152940(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback