VA SB713 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Quality; mathematics intervention services. Requires local school divisions to identify students in grades 10, 11, and 12 who are at risk of graduating without the necessary skills to take college-level mathematics coursework, as demonstrated by their individual performance on a Standards of Learning assessment, the PreACT, PSAT/NMSQT, ACT, or SAT, the Virginia Placement Test, or any diagnostic test that has been approved by the Department and to provide mathematics intervention services to such students. The bill requires such intervention services to be aligned with the developmental math curriculum offered by the Virginia Community College System and provides that local school divisions may partner with a local comprehensive community college to provide such intervention services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Quality; mathematics intervention services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-02-01SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104670D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback