VA SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Service of process on domestic limited liability company. Extends to domestic limited liability companies the rules for service of process on a domestic corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Service of process; domestic limited liability company.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
2018-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 475 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB71ER)
2018-03-05SenateEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB71S1
2018-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105851D-S1
2018-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-29SenateRead second time
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105851D-S1
2018-01-24SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2017-12-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101448D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801299(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB71
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB71+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB71S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB71ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0475+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0161+SB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0162SB0071+SB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0206SB0071+SB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0802V0100+SB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0560+SB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1138+SB0071

Bill Comments

feedback