VA SB707 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0986)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord and tenant; tenant rights and responsibilities. Requires the Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development to develop a statement of tenant rights and responsibilities explaining in plain language the rights and responsibilities of tenants under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act (§ 55.1-1200 et seq.) and maintain such statement on the Department's website along with a form to be signed by the parties to a rental agreement. The bill requires that the statement be provided to any prospective tenant and that the form developed by the Department be signed by the parties to the rental agreement. The bill prohibits a landlord from filing or maintaining an action against a tenant in a court of law for any alleged lease violation until he has provided the tenant with the statement of tenant rights and responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and tenant; statement of tenant rights and responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 10-N) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0986)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 986 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB707ER)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 40-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (55-Y 40-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-02HouseDelegates: Ward, Simon, Miyares
2020-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-28SenateSenators: McClellan, Hashmi, Kiggans
2020-02-28SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-28SenateSenate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N)
2020-02-26HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-25SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with substitute (59-Y 38-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB707H1
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108620D-H1
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108620D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 10-N)
2020-02-07SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106406D-ES1
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB707ES1
2020-02-07SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-07SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106406D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106406D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105101D

Same As/Similar To

HB393 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0985)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511204(n/a)See Bill Text
5511244(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB707&201+sum+SB707
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB707+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB707S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB707ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB707H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB707ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0986+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0070+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0178+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0382SB0707+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0437SB0707+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0393+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1165+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0955SB0707+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1254SB0707+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1776SB0707+SB0707
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2102+SB0707

Bill Comments

feedback