VA SB701 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vested rights; building permits. Provides that if a locality has issued a building permit, despite nonconformance with the zoning ordinance, and a property owner, relying in good faith on the issuance of the building permit, incurs extensive obligations or substantial expenses in diligent pursuit of a building project that is in conformance with the building permit and the Uniform Statewide Building Code, the locality shall not treat such building as an illegal use but rather as a legal nonconforming use. Current law requires that such project be completed and a certificate of occupancy issued in order to receive such protection. Vested rights; building permits. Provides that if a locality has issued a building permit, despite nonconformance with the zoning ordinance, and a property owner, relying in good faith on the issuance of the building permit, incurs extensive obligations or substantial expenses in diligent pursuit of a building project that is in conformance with the building permit and the Uniform Statewide Building Code, the locality shall not treat such building as an illegal use but rather as a legal nonconforming use. Current law requires that such project be completed and a certificate of occupancy issued in order to receive such protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vested rights; building permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
2024-04-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/24)
2024-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024
2024-03-07SenateSigned by President
2024-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2024-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB701ER)
2024-03-06SenateEnrolled
2024-03-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2024-03-01HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2024-03-01HouseRead third time
2024-02-29HouseRead second time
2024-02-27HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2024-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2024-02-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2024-02-16HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2024-02-16HouseRead first time
2024-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2024-02-13SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-12SenatePrinted as engrossed 24104047D-E
2024-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB701E
2024-02-12SenateAmendment by Senator French agreed to
2024-02-12SenateReading of amendment waived
2024-02-12SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2024-02-12SenateRead second time
2024-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2024-02-09SenatePassed by for the day
2024-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-07SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2024-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2024-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 24104047D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522307(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+SB701
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB701+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB701E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB701ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+CHAP0605+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB701AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB701ASR
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S12V0078+SB0701
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0292SB0701+SB0701
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0394SB0701+SB0701
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H1102V0076+SB0701
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H11V0243+SB0701
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV1364+SB0701

Bill Comments

feedback