VA SB701 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act and Virginia Freedom of Information Act; training requirements; executive directors and members of industrial development authorities and economic development authorities. Requires the executive director and members of each industrial development authority and economic development authority, as created by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, to take training on the provisions of the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act and the Freedom of Information Act at least once every two years. The bill requires such officials in office on July 1, 2020, to complete such training no later than December 31, 2020. Training on the Virginia Freedom of Information Act may be provided online by the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council or the local government attorney. Training on the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act shall be provided by the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council and may be provided online. The clerk of the respective governing body is responsible for maintaining training records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conflict of Interests Act, State & Local Gov't, and FOIA; training requirements for ex. directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
2020-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
2020-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
2020-02-21SenateSigned by President
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB701ER)
2020-02-20SenateEnrolled
2020-02-18HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseRead third time
2020-02-17HouseRead second time
2020-02-13HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102806D

Same As/Similar To

HB1527 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223132(n/a)See Bill Text
223704.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback