VA SB70 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1112)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Firearm sales; criminal history record information checks; penalty. Requires a background check for any firearm sale and directs the Department of State Police (the Department) to establish a process for transferors to obtain such a background check from licensed firearms dealers. A person who sells a firearm to another person without obtaining the required background check is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also provides that a purchaser who receives a firearm from another person without obtaining the required background check is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill removes the provision that makes background checks of prospective purchasers or transferees at firearms shows voluntary. The bill also provides that the Department shall have three business days to complete a background check before a firearm may be transferred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1112)
2020-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1112 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB70ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 46-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 46-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Plum, Hope, Fariss
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04SenateSenators: Lucas, Petersen, Obenshain
2020-03-04SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-04SenateSenate acceded to request (27-Y 13-N)
2020-03-03HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-03HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-03-02SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB70H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108843D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108843D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-16SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-01-16SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-01-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB70S1
2020-01-15SenateTitle replaced 20105589D-S1
2020-01-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to (36-Y 4-N)
2020-01-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-15SenateRead second time
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105589D-S1
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB12 (Saslaw)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-22SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101549D

Same As/Similar To

SB12 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB2 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1111)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:5(n/a)See Bill Text
221277.07(n/a)See Bill Text
5414201.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB70&201+sum+SB70
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB70+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB70S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB70H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB70ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1112+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0010+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0035SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0043SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0051SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0052SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0053SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0104+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1512+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1327SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1504SB0070+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1905+SB0070
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1759SB0070+SB0070

Bill Comments

feedback