VA SB698 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licenses; monthly revenue transfers. Requires the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, upon application by the distiller and satisfaction of certain eligibility criteria, to include in any agreement it enters into with the licensed distiller for the sale of alcoholic beverages provisions that allow monthly revenue transfers from the distiller to the Board to be submitted electronically and to be limited to the amount due to the Board in applicable taxes and markups. Under law that is set to become effective on July 1, 2020, the Board is required, without condition, to allow such electronic submission and to limit such monthly revenue transfers to the amount due to the Board in applicable taxes and markups.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; distiller licenses, monthly revenue transfers.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1017) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1017 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB698ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendments (82-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB698S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107002D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107002D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104995D |