VA SB697 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Execution of wills; witnesses. Requires the witnesses to a will to be disinterested, a term defined in the bill.
Title
Execution of wills; requires the witnesses to be disinterested, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102628D |