VA SB69 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; child care services provisions in rental agreements. Allows a rental agreement to contain provisions allowing for the tenant's operation of properly licensed and authorized child care services. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; child care services provisions in rental agreements. Allows a rental agreement to contain provisions allowing for the tenant's operation of properly licensed and authorized child care services.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; rental agreements, child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 267 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB69ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB69S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105853D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105853D-S1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100311D |