VA SB685 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced Manufacturing Talent Investment Fund. Creates the Advanced Manufacturing Talent Investment Fund to support the General Assembly's long-term goal of supporting efforts to increase the number of new eligible credentials in advanced manufacturing. The bill provides that moneys in the Fund shall also be used to improve the readiness of graduates to be employed in advanced manufacturing fields and fields that align with advanced manufacturing growth opportunities identified by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership.
Title
Advanced Manufacturing Talent Investment Fund; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB685ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: O'Quinn, Ballard, Rasoul |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Mason, Locke, Pillion |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-03 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB685H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106814D-H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106814D-H1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB685S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Barker agreed to 22106596D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22106596D-S1 (Barker) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22102566D |
Same As/Similar To
HB565 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
HB565 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
HB565 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)