VA SB683 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; media-related exemptions. Makes changes to the sales and use tax exemption for amplification, transmission, and distribution equipment used to provide Internet services. Under the bill, the exemption would apply to network equipment used to provide Internet service, regardless of whether the provider of such service is also a telephone common carrier or whether such network is also used to provide services other than Internet services.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; definitions, media-related exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-n) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-n) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 435 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB683ER) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-n) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22103553D-E |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB683E |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103553D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1155 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
HB1155 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
HB1155 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)