VA SB679 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; dashboard compilation of data derived from enhancement or remedial measures implemented by the Governor. Requires the Department of General Services to make available a dashboard compilation of purchase order reports from the Commonwealth's statewide electronic procurement system consisting of aggregated data showing (i) current fiscal year purchase orders, (ii) purchase orders from the previous fiscal year, and (iii) other relevant data derived from any enhancement or remedial measure implemented by the Governor pursuant to subsection C of § 2.2-4310 of the Code of Virginia.
Title
General Services, Department of; shall provide dashboard of purchase order reports from eVa.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB679ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB679S1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105069D-S1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105069D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104229D |