VA SB674 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0959)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Voluntary forest mitigation agreements. Authorizes the Secretary of Natural Resources, the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry, or any agency within those secretariats, or the Virginia Outdoors Foundation to enter into an agreement, with certain minimum provisions, with the owner or operator of construction projects to accomplish forest mitigation, as defined in the bill. The bill provides that no such agreement shall (i) include any waiver of liability for environmental damage caused by the construction project or (ii) guarantee regulatory approval for a construction project by any state agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary forest mitigation; agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 1-N 4-A) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0959)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 959 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB674ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House (63-Y 37-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2020-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB674S1
2020-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106282D-S1
2020-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-24SenateRead second time
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106282D-S1
2020-01-21SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 1-N 4-A)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102486D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011181.13(n/a)See Bill Text
1011181.14(n/a)See Bill Text
1011181.15(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB674&201+sum+SB674
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB674+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB674S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB674ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0959+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0019+SB0674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0135SB0674+SB0674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0180SB0674+SB0674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0103V0047+SB0674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0242+SB0674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1266+SB0674

Bill Comments

feedback