VA SB672 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; small employers; self-employed persons. Revises the definition of "small employer" for purposes of health insurance to provide that it includes a self-employed person. The measure also provides that an individual who is the sole shareholder of a corporation or sole member of a limited liability company, or an immediate family member of such sole shareholder or member, qualifies as an employee of the corporation or limited liability company if he performed any service for remuneration under a contract of hire for the corporation or limited liability company.
Title
Health insurance; small employers, self-employed persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782) | |
2018-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB672ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101776D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |