VA SB670 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health awareness training; firefighters and emergency medical services personnel. Requires fire departments and emergency medical services agencies to develop curricula for mental health awareness training for their personnel. The bill provides that such personnel who receive the training shall receive appropriate continuing education credits. This bill is identical to HB 1412.
Title
Mental health awareness; training for firefighters and emergency medical services personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 658 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB670ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100553D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 111.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |