VA SB670 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bank franchise tax. Sets a cap of $18 million on the total annual bank franchise tax liability per taxpayer. The cap will increase to $20 million if at least five taxpayers pay the $18 million cap for three consecutive years. After two years at $20 million, the cap shall increase by three percent annually.
Title
Bank franchise tax; sets a cap of $18 million on total annual tax liability per taxpayer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325) | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB670ER2) |
2016-03-10 | House | Enacted, Chapter 325 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2016-03-10 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB670ER) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-22 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16104089D-E |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB670E |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104089D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1224 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)