VA SB669 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Alleged wrongdoing of law-enforcement employees. Requires all law-enforcement agencies that employ at least 10 law-enforcement officers, to ensure that, in the case of all written citizen complaints or complaints submitted in an electronic format, the agency (i) allows for the submission of citizen complaints through the agency's website or other electronic format; (ii) provides a receipt or written acknowledgment confirming the submission of the complaint to the individual filing such complaint; (iii) provides a written response to any individual who has filed a complaint indicating the complaint has been finalized, and (iv) provides notice to any individual who has filed a complaint if an investigation into a previously filed complaint has been reopened upon the submission of new materials after a final resolution for the previously filed complaint has been reached. Alleged wrongdoing of law-enforcement employees. Requires all law-enforcement agencies that employ at least 10 law-enforcement officers, to ensure that, in the case of all written citizen complaints or complaints submitted in an electronic format, the agency (i) allows for the submission of citizen complaints through the agency's website or other electronic format; (ii) provides a receipt or written acknowledgment confirming the submission of the complaint to the individual filing such complaint; (iii) provides a written response to any individual who has filed a complaint indicating the complaint has been finalized, and (iv) provides notice to any individual who has filed a complaint if an investigation into a previously filed complaint has been reopened upon the submission of new materials after a final resolution for the previously filed complaint has been reached.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement employees; alleged wrongdoing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-08HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2022-03-04HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2022-02-27HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2022-02-24HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2022-02-24HouseRead first time
2022-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2022-02-15SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2022-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2022-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB669S1
2022-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 22105569D-S1
2022-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2022-02-15SenateRead second time
2022-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2022-02-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 22105569D-S1
2022-02-14SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
2022-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2022-01-20SenatePresented and ordered printed 22104590D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91600(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+sum+SB669
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB669+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+ful+SB669S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/22105569D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+SB669F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+oth+SB669FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+S03V0170+SB0669
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0480SB0669+SB0669
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0493SB0669+SB0669
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+SV0494SB0669+SB0669
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?221+vot+H0801V0431+SB0669

Bill Comments

feedback