VA SB669 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB669

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Animal testing; breeding. Prohibits any person from breeding a dog or cat for the express purpose of producing offspring for (i) use in research, experimentation, or testing that is not required pursuant to federal law or regulation or (ii) sale to a manufacturer, institution of higher learning, or contract testing facility outside the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal testing; breeding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-04SenateContinued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-04SenateIncorporates SB311 (Stanley)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20107682D-S1
2020-01-21SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-01-16SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105138D

Same As/Similar To

SB669 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326592.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback