VA SB665 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electronic Identity Management Act; federated digital identity systems. Amends the Electronic Identity Management Act to accommodate federated digital identity systems. A federated digital identity system (federation) is defined in the measure as a digital identity system that uses federated identity management to enable the portability of identity information across otherwise autonomous security domains. Federated identity management is defined in the measure as a process that allows the conveyance of identity credentials and authentication information across digital identity systems through the use of a common set of policies, practices, and protocols for managing the identity of users and devices across security domains. The digital identity systems involved in a federation are required to be compliant with the Commonwealth's identity management standards and with the provisions of the governing identity trust framework.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Identity Management Act; definitions, federated digital identity systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB665ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N)
2020-02-27HousePassed House (93-Y 6-N)
2020-02-27HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-24HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (18-Y 4-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
2020-02-21HouseAssigned CT & I sub: Communications
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB665S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108035D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108035D-S1
2020-02-10SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102986D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591550(n/a)See Bill Text
591553(n/a)See Bill Text
591555(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB665&201+sum+SB665
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB665+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB665S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB665ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0736+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0140+SB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0591SB0665+SB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0592SB0665+SB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0593SB0665+SB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H2101V0018+SB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H21V0059+SB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1572+SB0665

Bill Comments

feedback