VA SB662 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB662
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Continued to 2023 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Continued to 2023 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; School Quality Profiles; teacher data. Requires the Department of Education to include on each School Quality Profile data on teachers' race and proficiency in any language other than English.
Title
School Quality Profiles; teacher data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Continued to 2023 in Education by voice vote |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104335D |
Same As/Similar To
SB662 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Continued to 2023 in Education by voice vote