VA SB660 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Youth Employment Solutions apprenticeship program. Directs the Department of Labor and Industry and the Department of Education to determine the feasibility of implementing a Youth Employment Solutions (YES) apprenticeship program. A, YES apprenticeship program, is a program under which the appropriate agencies of the Commonwealth enter into an agreement with a private staffing firm under which the firm provides services to an employer that result in the assumption by the private staffing firm of duties and responsibilities, with regard to apprentices, including duties and responsibilities arising with respect to the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act and insurance liability, that would otherwise apply to the employer. The measure directs the Departments to (i) identify potential benefits and problems of implementing a YES apprenticeship program, (ii) determine whether one or more private staffing firms are willing to participate, and (iii) ascertain whether existing law prevents implementation of a YES apprenticeship program and, if so, identify such law in a report.
Title
Youth Employment Solutions apprenticeship program; feasibility of implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB660S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106923D-S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106923D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100690D |