VA SB655 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Summary
Contractors; employees having direct contact with students on school property; penalty. Provides that the contractor must certify that all persons having direct contact with students on school property under a contract for the provision of services have not been convicted of a felony barrier crime.
Title
Contractors; employees having direct contact with students on school property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-29 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2008-02-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084614612 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB655 |