VA SB653 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
Hearing: Feb 20 in House Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; real estate brokers; escrow funds. Provides that in the event of foreclosure of real property, all rent moneys, regardless of when received, shall be deposited in an escrow account by the end of the fifth business banking day following receipt, unless otherwise agreed to in writing by the principals to a lease transaction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate brokers; escrow funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102093D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412108.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback