VA SB652 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB652
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; application requirements; last four digits of social security number. Requires an applicant for an absentee ballot to provide on the application the last four digits of his social security number, except when completing the application in person, and further provides that the failure to include such information shall be a material omission, grounds for rejection of the application. Absentee voting; application requirements; last four digits of social security number. Requires an applicant for an absentee ballot to provide on the application the last four digits of his social security number, except when completing the application in person, and further provides that the failure to include such information shall be a material omission, grounds for rejection of the application.
Title
Absentee voting; application requirements, last four digits of social security number.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Bloxom, Ransone, Glass |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Vogel, McClellan, Boysko |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House with amendments (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate Sickles rejected |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-10 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB652S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105809D-S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105809D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103317D |
Same As/Similar To
SB652 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455