VA SB650 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration by political party affiliation; primary elections. Adds party affiliation, beginning January 1, 2017, to the information that an applicant is asked to provide when registering to vote. The applicant may indicate that he is an independent. Voters registered prior to January 1, 2017, will be designated as independent unless they provide a political party designation in writing to the general registrar. Voters may change their party affiliation or independent status by written notice at any time before the registration records are closed prior to an election. The state party chairman of each political party must notify the State Board of Elections by January 31 of each year of the rules adopted by the duly constituted authorities of the state political party governing who may participate in the party's primaries held from April 1 of that year through March 31 of the following year.
Title
Primary elections; voter registration by political party affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Finance (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Finance (12-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103319D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 418.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 423.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 516.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |