VA SB646 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tetrahydrocannabinol concentration; definition. Clarifies that certain uses of "tetrahydrocannabinol concentration" refer to delta-9-tetrahydrocannabinol. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tetrahydrocannabinol concentration; definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 831 (effective 4/7/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB646ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB646S1
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107636D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107636D-S1
2020-01-14SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Hemp
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20105071D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182247(n/a)See Bill Text
191188.1(n/a)See Bill Text
324112(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.7(n/a)See Bill Text
5413446(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB646&201+sum+SB646
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB646+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB646S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB646ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0831+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0042+SB0646
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0382SB0646+SB0646
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0403SB0646+SB0646
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0404SB0646+SB0646
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0198+SB0646
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0403+SB0646
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1879+SB0646

Bill Comments

feedback