VA SB641 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB641

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Civil action; sale of personal data. Requires a person that disseminates, obtains, maintains, or collects personal data about a consumer for a fee to implement security practices to protect the confidentiality of a consumer's personal data, obtain express consent of a parent of a minor before selling the personal data of such minor, provide access to consumers to their own personal data that is held by the entity, refrain from maintaining or selling data that it knows to be inaccurate, and provide a means by which a consumer can opt out of the sale of his personal data. The bill provides that a violation could result in a civil penalty of up to $7,500 or damages to be awarded to a consumer. The bill also provides for the award of attorney fees and costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil action; sale of personal data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Judiciary
2020-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104658D

Same As/Similar To

SB641 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80140.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback