VA SB64 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulation of signage in highway rights of way. Allows county employees and volunteers who are acting as agents of the Commonwealth Transportation Commissioner to remove and confiscate signs from the public right-of-way. If a sign is confiscated by an employee or volunteer, the sign owner shall have the right to reclaim the sign within five business days of the date of such confiscation. Finally, the legislation clarifies that a sign installed (on private property) that does not require use of tools or equipment does not trigger the requirement to call Miss Utility before installing the sign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Signs; provides local government authority to regulate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (78-Y 11-N) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
2010-04-21 House: Enacted, Chapter 777 (effective 7/1/10)
2010-04-21 Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled
2010-04-21 House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
2010-04-21 Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB64ER2)
2010-04-21 House: Reenrolled
2010-04-21 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2010-04-21 House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (78-Y 11-N)
2010-04-21 House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (78-Y 11-N)
2010-04-21 Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2010-04-20 Senate: Placed on Calendar
2010-04-13 Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate
2010-03-12 Senate: Signed by President
2010-03-10 House: Signed by Speaker
2010-03-10 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB64ER)
2010-03-10 Senate: Enrolled
2010-03-02 Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-26 House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N)
2010-02-26 House: Passed House with amendments (87-Y 9-N)
2010-02-26 House: Engrossed by House as amended
2010-02-26 House: Committee amendments agreed to
2010-02-26 House: Read third time
2010-02-25 House: Read second time
2010-02-23 House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
2010-02-16 House: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2010-02-16 House: Read first time
2010-02-16 House: Placed on Calendar
2010-02-09 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-08 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB64S1
2010-02-08 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104850D-S1
2010-02-08 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2010-02-08 Senate: Read second time
2010-02-04 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-02 Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2010-02-02 Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104850D-S1
2010-01-04 Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government
2010-01-04 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102001D

Same As/Similar To

HB553 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522286(n/a)See Bill Text
1522286.2(n/a)See Bill Text
331373(n/a)See Bill Text
331375.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+SB64
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB64+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB64S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB64ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB64ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+CHAP0777+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+S07V0052+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0192SB0064+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0225SB0064+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H19V0172+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1036+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0532SB0064+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0943SB0064+SB0064
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1827+SB0064

Bill Comments

feedback