VA SB634 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

State Corporation Commission; powers and duties. Provides that in proceedings before the State Corporation Commission relating to the regulation and oversight of utilities, the Commission shall consider public health and safety, the economy of the Commonwealth, the promotion of workforce development for residents of the Commonwealth, and the maintenance of fair labor standards for workers employed by public service companies and their contractors, if applicable to the proceeding. State Corporation Commission; powers and duties. Provides that in proceedings before the State Corporation Commission relating to the regulation and oversight of utilities, the Commission shall consider public health and safety, the economy of the Commonwealth, the promotion of workforce development for residents of the Commonwealth, and the maintenance of fair labor standards for workers employed by public service companies and their contractors, if applicable to the proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Corporation Commission; powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto
2024-04-17SenatePassed by for the day
2024-04-08 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2024-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024
2024-03-09SenateSigned by President
2024-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2024-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB634ER)
2024-03-08SenateEnrolled
2024-03-05SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2024-03-04SenatePassed by for the day
2024-03-01HouseVOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N)
2024-03-01HousePassed House with amendment (50-Y 47-N)
2024-03-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2024-03-01HouseCommittee amendment #2 agreed to
2024-03-01HouseCommittee amendment #1 rejected
2024-03-01HouseRead third time
2024-02-29HouseRead second time
2024-02-27HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N)
2024-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N)
2024-02-19HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2024-02-16HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2024-02-16HouseRead first time
2024-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2024-02-13SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2024-02-12SenatePrinted as engrossed 24104287D-E
2024-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB634E
2024-02-12SenateAmendments by Senator Rouse agreed to
2024-02-12SenateReading of amendment waived
2024-02-12SenateRead second time
2024-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-09SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N)
2024-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2024-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 24104287D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12112(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+SB634
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB634+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB634E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB634ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB634AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24108438A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB634AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB634AHE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB634AHR
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB634AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB634F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB634FE171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S02V0072+SB0634
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0329SB0634+SB0634
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0417SB0634+SB0634
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H1403V0029+SB0634
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H14V0201+SB0634
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV1378+SB0634
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0949SB0634+SB0634

Bill Comments

feedback