VA SB634 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative and efficient energies; subsidies and rebates. Creates incentive programs relating to the adoption of alternative and efficient energies. The bill establishes the Energy Efficiency Subsidy Program to fund grants to subsidize residential energy efficiency measures and directs the Department of Taxation to study the possibility of incorporating an electric vehicle rebate into the Program. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Alternative and efficient energies; subsidies and effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102581D-E |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB634E |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102581D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 179.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 179.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 179.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1583 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |